Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 51 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 4966 Week
» 16203 Month
» 249123 Year
» 1914499 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 8608 m/e 10/1943
British Railways 48608 w/e 09/10/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 8F
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Eastleigh Works
To Service During 10/1943
Withdrawal Sun 13/02/1966
Service Life 22 yrs, 4 mths , 14 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 05/1966

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 10/1943
16C   Kirkby in Ashfield on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
20G   Hellifield w/e 24/01/1948
20C   Royston 3w/e 24/01/1953
56D   Mirfield w/e 23/01/1960
     Withdrawn on 13/02/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 20G Hellifield w/e 24/01/1948
ALLOC 20B Stourton 4w/e 24/01/1953
EXLOAN 5B Crewe South 4w/e 13/07/1957
ALLOC 56D Mirfield 4w/e 23/01/1960
WDN   on 13/02/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
12/03/1961 Horwich Works (Works Yard) Works Yard: D3925, 40146, 42723/79, 42890, 43880, 44126, 44455, 44512/44, 48118/64, 48507, 48608, 48742/56, 51229, 51441/96, 52270, 52415. Scrap Yard: 50746, 52201/44, 52355. Erecting Shop: D3932-6, D4011/2, 12004/5/46, 42822/4/67/70, 42959/69/75/84, 43000/19, 44099, 44113/97, 44446, 44595, 48056, 48113, 48332, 48454, 48513, 48640/76, 48708, 76077/83, Car Shop: uM28306/81M, uM28586M. Paint Shop: 13247, uM28330M, and the usual preserved engines; Works Shunters: 11304/5/24/68, 47402, 51429. SLS/196105

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1943 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8608
Built at Eastleigh Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Kirkby in Ashfield (16C)    
24/01/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Hellifield (20G)    
09/10/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 48608    
24/01/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Royston (20C)    
23/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Mirfield (56D)    
13/02/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 48608    
05/1966 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev