Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 175 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 3688 Week
» 23981 Month
» 201885 Year
» 1867261 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 8609 m/e 10/1943
British Railways 48609 w/e 11/06/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 8F
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Eastleigh Works
To Service During 10/1943
Withdrawal w/e Sat 13/01/1968
Service Life 24 yrs, 3 mths , 14 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 04/1968

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 10/1943
18D   Staveley (Barrow Hill) on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
20F   Skipton w/e 17/09/1949
20A   Holbeck (MR) w/e 02/06/1951
20A   Holbeck (MR) 4w/e 16/06/1951
21A   Saltley w/e 27/10/1951
15B   Kettering 4w/e 12/07/1952
15B   Wellingborough w/e 18/01/1964
15A   Leicester Midland w/e 26/06/1965
16B   Colwick w/e 15/01/1966
9H   Patricroft w/e 07/01/1967
     Withdrawn w/e 13/01/1968

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 20F Skipton w/e 17/09/1949
ALLOC 20A Holbeck (MR) w/e 02/06/1951
ALLOC 21A Saltley w/e 27/10/1951
ALLOC 15B Kettering 4w/e 12/07/1952
ALLOC 15B Wellingborough 3w/e 01/02/1964
ALLOC 15A Leicester Midland 4w/e 10/07/1965
ALLOC 16B Colwick 4w/e 05/02/1966
ALLOC 9H Patricroft w/e 07/01/1967
WDN 9H Patricroft w/e 13/01/1968

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
12/11/1959 Derby Works (Erecting Shop:-No. 1 Bay) Paint Shop:- M.R. 1000, 40026 G, 40031 G, 42350 I, 42540 I, 44428/521 I. 75013 I, D3795 New, D5028 New, D8 New; Diesel Erecting Shop:-12036/94, 13053; New Work:-6D-E.Sh. D3797-802uc; Test House:-D3796; Erecting Shop:-No. 1 Bay, 40039 G, 42387 I, 42527 G, 42537 G, 43887 G, 44104 G, 44109 I, 44143 I, 44296 I, 47286 G, 47292 I, 47522 I, 47592 G, 47673 G, 48609/69 G, 73131/7 I, 75063 I, Stripping:-42412/28stripping; Erecting Shop:-No. 2 Bay:- 44197 I, 44735 Cas, 75036 I; Stripping:- 73066stripping; Erecting Shop:-No. 3 Bay:- 10 Bo-Bo 1160 H.P. D-E, 3 1-Co-Co-1 2300 H.P. D-E; Diesel Finishing Shop:-D5/7, D5029; Yard:-40513/680/925, 42312/21/54/85/88/507/80, 43233/47 94/370/531/766/85/829/934/98, 44694, 47309, 48000, 75050, 80065/82, 10100/800, 12093, D6, ED6. Cecil Raikes. SLS/195912
25/02/1962 Derby Works (Erecting Shop) Works Sidings: D2506, D3124, D5035/73/5/80/6, ED3, 12000/63, 42332/75, 47003, 47218, 47353, 47404/44/73/5, 48533, 58214, 73130, 75035. Gasworks : Nil, Roundhouse: M.R. 118/58A, Cecil Raikes, Thundersley. New Paint Shop: D157, M.R. 1000. Outside New Paint Shop: L.N.W.R, 2650, 48081. Diesel Test House: D158. Outside Diesel Test House: 12051. Diesel Finishing Shop: D38, D159/60, D5081/2, D5145. New Erecting Shop: D161-70. Erecting Shop: D2213, D3052, D3578, D3843, 13117, 42078, 42327/43/81, 43953, 44112, 44279, 44304/87, 44416, 47165, 47293/5, 47325, 47441, 47515, 47653, 48105/8, 48609, 48763, 75048. Diesel Repair Shop: D10/98/9, D122/9, D2236, D2864, D2904/12, D5018/23/6/76, D5142/6, ED1, Shed Road: 41168, 42363, 42448, Awaiting Works: 42409, 47483, 47643. SLS/196204

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1943 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8609
Built at Eastleigh Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Staveley (Barrow Hill) (18D)    
11/06/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 48609    
17/09/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Skipton (20F)    
02/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (20A)    
16/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (20A)    
27/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Saltley (21A)    
12/07/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Kettering (15B)    
18/01/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Wellingborough (15B)    
26/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15A)    
15/01/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (16B)    
07/01/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Patricroft (9H)    
13/01/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as 48609    
04/1968 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev