Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 207 Today
» 997 Yesterday
» 3239 Week
» 21291 Month
» 254211 Year
» 1919587 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 8610 m/e 04/1943
British Railways 48610 w/e 02/04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 8F
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 04/1943
Withdrawal w/e Sat 07/08/1965
Service Life 22 yrs, 4 mths , 7 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 09/1965

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 04/1943
1A   Willesden on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
1E   Bletchley 4w/e 30/11/1957
5E   Nuneaton w/e 10/07/1965
     Withdrawn w/e 07/08/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 1E Bletchley 4w/e 30/11/1957
ALLOC 5E Nuneaton 4w/e 10/07/1965
WDN   w/e 07/08/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/03/1949 Crewe Works During the past month a further seven Class '5' 4-6-0's-Nos. 44718-24 inclusive-have been put into traffic, painted black with red, cream and grey lining but carrying neither lettering nor crests on the tender sides. No. 46202 recently returned to traffic. The engine was run in on trips from Crewe to Shrewsbury during W/E 19/3, and returned to the regular London-Liverpool working the following week. Since then, however, it is reported to have failed again at Camden, details are not known.
Dynamometer car trials were carried out with Class '4' 2-6-0 No. 43027 on the Crewe-Holyhead line during W/E 9/4; the dynamometer car used was No. 1. Locomotives entering Works during March included:-Nos. 42227/52, 2263/66, 2432/54/80, 2541/44/63, 2611/13/42/50/57/60/73, 44745, 4775, 4819/72/97, 4911/39/63, 44984, 5046/54/88, 45091, 5110/45, 45195, 45229/34, 5244, 45264, 5269/96/7/8, 45326, 5343/82/84, 5408, 5501, 45520, 5556, 45568, 5591, 45597, 5659/70, 45676/90/99, 5703/35, 6004, 46100, 6103/10/13/21, 46134, 6155/56, 46160/63, 6169, 6206/27, 46231, 6235/50/1/2/5, 7972, 47982, 7994/95, 8026/75, 8112/50/57, 8206/70, 8301/2/3/17/24/31/50/61/67, 8495, 8522, 8610/45/91, 48696, 8770, 8906/18, 9042/52/74, 9110/11/66/85, 9210/59/63/89/96/97, 9305/29/40/63/81, 9419/27/29, 28619, 58889 and 2-10-0 73788 (65F).
SLS/194905

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1943 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8610
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Willesden (1A)    
02/04/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 48610    
30/11/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Bletchley (1E)    
10/07/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Nuneaton (5E)    
07/08/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 48610    
09/1965 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev