Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 26 Online
» 4141 Today
» 4916 Yesterday
» 13715 Week
» 78669 Month
» 281333 Year
» 3308186 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
8616 |
m/e |
10/1943 |
British Railways |
48616 |
w/e |
18/02/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
8F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Brighton Works |
To Service |
During 10/1943 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 22/10/1960 |
Service Life |
17 yrs , 22 dys |
Information |
First of Class.withdrawn, after serious accident Jun-1960 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 10/1960 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
20G |
Hellifield |
w/e |
24/01/1948 |
LOAN |
18A |
Toton |
4w/e |
12/07/1958 |
ALLOC |
18A |
Toton |
4w/e |
04/10/1958 |
ALLOC |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
4w/e |
30/05/1959 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
22/10/1960 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1943 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8616 Built at Brighton Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Kirkby in Ashfield (16C) |
|
|
24/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hellifield (20G) |
|
|
18/02/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 48616 |
|
|
12/07/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (18A) |
|
|
23/05/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood East (14A) |
|
|
10/1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
22/10/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 48616 |
|
|