Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 26 Online
» 2439 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15845 Week
» 68861 Month
» 188388 Year
» 3215241 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
8631 |
m/e |
06/1943 |
British Railways |
48631 |
w/e |
15/10/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
8F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Brighton Works |
To Service |
During 06/1943 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 24/02/1968 |
Service Life |
24 yrs, 8 mths , 24 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
15/04/1962 |
Bolton MPD (Ex Works) |
Ex Works on Bolton (26C) Shed: 42772, 42942, 44346, 44405, 48631, 76020. |
SLS/196205 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1943 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8631 Built at Brighton Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Shrewsbury (4A) |
|
|
28/02/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
06/03/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
15/10/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 48631 |
|
|
01/10/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Northwich (8E) |
|
|
24/02/1968 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 48631 |
|
|
06/1968 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cohens: Kettering |
|
|