Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 300 Today
» 825 Yesterday
» 2001 Week
» 10116 Month
» 137559 Year
» 1802935 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 8648 m/e 12/1943
British Railways 48648 w/e 20/11/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 8F
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Brighton Works
To Service During 12/1943
Withdrawal w/e Sat 22/07/1967
Service Life 23 yrs, 7 mths , 22 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 11/1967 at Cashmore's (Newport)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 12/1943
1A   Willesden on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
6C   Birkenhead Mollington Street w/e 11/11/1961
6G   Llandudno Junction w/e 14/09/1963
8H   Birkenhead Mollington Street w/e 07/11/1964
8L   Aintree w/e 17/04/1965
8C   Speke Junction w/e 20/08/1966
     Withdrawn w/e 22/07/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street 4w/e 02/12/1961
ALLOC 6G Llandudno Junction 5w/e 12/10/1963
ALLOC 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street 4w/e 07/11/1964
ALLOC 8L Aintree 4w/e 08/05/1965
ALLOC 8C Speke Junction 5w/e 10/09/1966
WDN   w/e 22/07/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
25/06/1961 Crewe Works (Works Sidings) Paint Shop: D112/3, 41326, 44682, 48549, 49395, 90537, Outside Paint Shop: D109-11, 10203, 45080, 45203, 45426, 46232, 46404, 48553, 48707, 70004. Works Sidings: 41229, 42118, 45104, 45218, 45438, 45516/29, 46155, 48287, 48648/97, 48761, 90163, 90327/81/8, 90685, 92030/77. Erecting Shop: D5016, 42136/58, 42234, 42452/78, 42589, 42651, 44658/85, 44714/28/48, 44857, 44949/87, 45021, 45107/89, 45238/47/8/9/86/96, 45367/70/94, 45410/35/45, 45588, 45641/58/61, 46102/42/7, 46243, 46441, 46502, 48154, 48264, 48375, 48446, 48724/67, 49048, 90125, 90264/66, 90338, 90408, 90528, 90646, 92074. Outside Erecting Shop: D78, D108, 42226, 44888, 44946, 45254, 45615, 46131, 46238, 46484, 92032. New Erecting Shop: D75, D114-26. Scrap Yard: 40050, 40126/55/71, 47571, 47605 all intact. SLS/196108
16/12/1963 Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) Paint Shop: 49395, D252/8, D1031, D1550/1, D1554-7, 26056. Outside: 44671/86, 45072/139/491, 45736, 46452, 48255/411/632, 70025, 73128, 77002, 78028, D229, D287, D356/74, D1032/3, D1552/3. Weigh House: 45327. Yard: 42355, 44714/919, 45006/19/308/75/406/38, 46142, 46448, 48219/415/8, 78023, 92034/67/90/114, D338. Electric Traction Shop: D202, D8006, 26016, 27002. Erecting Shop: 42076, 44726/856/900/32/58, 45003/280/96/316,, 48128/412/614/48/706, 73127, 78033/64, 84013, 92011/24/81/111/128/59/83, D221, D280/8/9/93/4, D301/14/45/69/85/92, D6758, D8024/67. New Construction: D1034 an D1558-75. Outside: 44676, 46143 and 42441remains. Cut-up Shop: 42785 an 90338. SLS/196401

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1943 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8648
Built at Brighton Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Willesden (1A)    
20/11/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 48648    
11/11/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (6C)    
14/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (6G)    
07/11/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (8H)    
17/04/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (8L)    
20/08/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C)    
22/07/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 48648    
11/1967 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev