Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 55 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 2981 Week
» 4719 Month
» 132162 Year
» 1797538 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 8678 m/e 06/1944
British Railways 48678 w/e 07/05/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 8F
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Brighton Works
To Service During 06/1944
Withdrawal w/e Sat 29/06/1968
Service Life 24 yrs , 29 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 11/1968

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 06/1944
15A   Wellingborough on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
38B   Annesley m/e 21/07/1956
15A   Wellingborough 4w/e 29/12/1956
14A   Cricklewood East w/e 23/05/1959
16D   Annesley w/e 13/04/1963
16G   Westhouses w/e 25/04/1964
16F   Burton w/e 02/05/1964
16E   Kirkby in Ashfield w/e 13/03/1965
16G   Westhouses w/e 12/02/1966
16B   Colwick w/e 22/10/1966
8F   Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 12/11/1966
9D   Newton Heath w/e 09/12/1967
     Withdrawn w/e 29/06/1968

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 38B Annesley 4w/e 21/07/1956
LOAN 91E To Eastern Region 4w/e 11/08/1956
EXLOAN 15A Wellingborough 4w/e 29/12/1956
EXLOAN 91M To London Midland Region 4w/e 29/12/1956
ALLOC 14A Cricklewood East 4w/e 30/05/1959
ALLOC 16D Annesley 5w/e 04/05/1963
ALLOC 16F Burton 4w/e 02/05/1964
ALLOC 16E Kirkby in Ashfield 5w/e 13/03/1965
ALLOC 16G Westhouses 5w/e 12/03/1966
ALLOC 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 5w/e 12/11/1966
ALLOC 9D Newton Heath w/e 30/12/1967
WDN 9D Newton Heath w/e 29/06/1968

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
04/02/1962 Derby Works (Erecting Shop) Roundhouse: M.R.118/58A, Cecil Raikes, Thundersley. Erecting Shop: 13117, 13292, 42078, 42322/35/84, 42400/9, 43295, 44112/76, 44403, 44580, 47250/89, 47461/99, 47543/65, 47631, 48149, 48355/67, 48678, 75019/46/8. New Paint Shop: D154/5, M.R.1000. Outside New Paint Shop: L.N.W.R, 2650. Diesel Finishing Shop: D72/9, D111/56/7. New Erecting Shop: D158-67. Works Sidings: D10/84, D128, D5142, ED1, 12000, 42306/30, 43679, 44165, 44241, 47003, 47516, 47678, 58214, 75035. Gasworks Siding: Nil. Diesel Test House: D5016. Outside Diesel Test House: D123, D2198, D2221. Diesel Shunter Test House: Nil. Diesel Repair Shop: D2, D122, D2213/20, D2395, D2904, D5018/9/75/7, 11155. Works Shunter: 47325. Shed road: 41168, 42328/63/8/95, 42404/48, 47218. E SLS/196203
25/02/1962 Derby MPD Ex-Works on Shed: D155/6, D3174, D3292, 42306/22/35, 42400, 44165/79, 44241, 44403, 44580, 47250/89, 4/375, 47461/99, 47543/65, 48367, 48678. SLS/196204

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1944 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8678
Built at Brighton Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Wellingborough (15A)    
07/05/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 48678    
21/07/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (38B)    
29/12/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Wellingborough (15A)    
23/05/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Cricklewood East (14A)    
13/04/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (16D)    
25/04/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Westhouses (16G)    
02/05/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Burton (16F)    
13/03/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Kirkby in Ashfield (16E)    
12/02/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Westhouses (16G)    
22/10/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (16B)    
12/11/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
09/12/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (9D)    
29/06/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as 48678    
11/1968 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev