Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 6 Online
» 288 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18091 Week
» 71107 Month
» 190634 Year
» 3217487 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
8682 |
m/e |
01/1944 |
British Railways |
48682 |
w/e |
27/11/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
8F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Brighton Works |
To Service |
During 01/1944 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 25/09/1965 |
Service Life |
21 yrs, 8 mths , 25 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 12/1965 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1944 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8682 Built at Brighton Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Canklow (19C) |
|
|
19/06/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
27/11/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 48682 |
|
|
08/10/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mold Junction (6B) |
|
|
31/12/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Heaton Mersey (19D) |
|
|
14/01/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Heaton Mersey (19D) |
|
|
26/09/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
10/10/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Agecroft (9J) |
|
|
25/09/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 48682 |
|
|
12/1965 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|