Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 322 Today
» 825 Yesterday
» 2023 Week
» 10138 Month
» 137581 Year
» 1802957 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 8704 m/e 06/1944
British Railways 48704 w/e 19/11/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 8F
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Brighton Works
To Service During 06/1944
Withdrawal w/e Sat 11/09/1965
Service Life 21 yrs, 3 mths , 11 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 12/1965 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 06/1944
15B   Kettering on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
16C   Derby w/e 19/09/1964
9G   Gorton w/e 07/11/1964
8B   Warrington Dallam w/e 27/03/1965
8L   Aintree w/e 17/04/1965
     Withdrawn w/e 11/09/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 16C Derby 3w/e 03/10/1964
ALLOC 9G Gorton 4w/e 07/11/1964
ALLOC 8B Warrington Dallam 2w/e 10/04/1965
ALLOC 8L Aintree 4w/e 08/05/1965
WDN   w/e 11/09/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
13/04/1960 Derby Works (Erecting Shop, No. 1 Bay) Paint Shop: 42500 G, 75053 I, D3952/3 New, D5114 New, D5713 Casual. Diesel Erecting Shop:-10001 G, 12045/70/6/99, 13118, D2901/8, D8004, 4 D.E. Sh. 0-6-0. Erecting Shop, No. 1 Bay:-42099 G, 42219/389/406/520 G, 42556 I, 47578 G, 48027/64/673 I, 48696 G 48704 G, 75012/19 I. No. 1 Bay Stripping:- 42213/311, 44289. Erecting Shop, No. 2 Bay:- 44270 Casual, 9 0-6-0 D.E. Sh. No. 2 Bay Stripping:- 44133, 48403, 73004. Erecting Shop, No. 3 Bay:- D5003 Casual 3 1.Co-Co.1 2300 H.P. D.E., 8 Bo-Bo 1160 H.P. D.E. (D5118 etc.) Test House:- 10202, D2220, D3955/7, D5117, D8012. Diesel Finishing Shop:- D214, D5014 Casual, D5115/6. Yard:- 40070, 40633, 42211, 42301/20/8/31/2/53/62/417/48, 43314, 43637, 44209/406/515, 47326/96, 47400 Frames, 48100/661, 75036/54, M.R. 1000 Cecil Raikes, D10, D3015, D5716/18, ED6, 10100, 10800. SLS/196005
09/07/1962 Derby Works (Stone Pit) Diesel Erecting Shop: E3071 (arrived at Derby on June 20th for testing purposes), ED3, D37, D62, D79, D104, D117/8, D176, D3018, D5009/27, D5135. Outside Diesel Erecting Shop: D3291. Test House: D46, D97, D173/5, D308, D5019. Shunter Test House: D3125. New Building: D180-D189. Finishing Shop: D63, D92, D177/8, D287. Erecting Shop: ED1, D3177, 13121, 41533, 42095, 42240/7, 44049, 44214, 44362, 47532, 48607, 73066/70, 73131/7/8, 75038/63. Paint Shop: D174, MR1000. 'Stone Pit': 44583, 48167, 48704. 'Foundry Row': 44030, 44158. 'Klondyke Sidings' : D38, D50, D5017, 10201/3, plus frames of an unidentified diesel shunter (d12000?). Shop Road: 48673. 'Bone Yard': 42146/84 (both stored). SLS/196208
10/08/1962 Derby MPD Ex-Works on Shed: D38 (82A), D3018 (2A), D5075 (2A), D5139 (9A), 41533 (41E), 42095 (12C), 44162 (18A), 45240 (5A) - Ex Crewe, 48167 (18A), 48704 (15B), 73066 (14D), D54 new ex Crewe arrived on Shed towing D2506 (5A) for works attention. SLS/196209

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1944 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8704
Built at Brighton Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Kettering (15B)    
19/11/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 48704    
19/09/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (16C)    
07/11/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (9G)    
27/03/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B)    
17/04/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (8L)    
11/09/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 48704    
12/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev prev