Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 91 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 19002 Week
» 83956 Month
» 286620 Year
» 3313473 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7666 |
m/e |
08/1944 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
3115 |
m/e |
04/1946 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1947) |
3515 |
m/e |
03/1947 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
8720 |
m/e |
10/1947 |
British Railways |
48720 |
w/e |
21/01/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
8F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Brighton Works |
To Service |
During 08/1944 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 29/06/1968 |
Service Life |
23 yrs, 10 mths , 29 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 10/1968 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1944 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 7666 Built at Brighton Works |
|
|
04/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3115 |
|
|
03/1947 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3515 |
|
|
10/1947 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8720 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Lostock Hall (24C) |
|
|
30/04/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mirfield (25D) |
|
|
21/01/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 48720 |
|
|
30/09/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A) |
|
|
07/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A) |
|
|
27/01/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (6C) |
|
|
28/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (6C) |
|
|
26/01/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Widnes (8D) |
|
|
17/05/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B) |
|
|
25/10/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A) |
|
|
05/01/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Patricroft (26F) |
|
|
29/01/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Heaton Mersey (9F) |
|
|
11/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bolton (9K) |
|
|
29/06/1968 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 48720 |
|
|
10/1968 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|