Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 838 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18641 Week
» 71657 Month
» 191184 Year
» 3218037 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7672 |
m/e |
09/1944 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
3121 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1947) |
3521 |
m/e |
03/1947 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
8726 |
m/e |
11/1947 |
British Railways |
48726 |
w/e |
17/09/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
8F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Brighton Works |
To Service |
During 09/1944 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 17/09/1966 |
Service Life |
22 yrs , 17 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1944 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 7672 Built at Brighton Works |
|
|
05/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3121 |
|
|
03/1947 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3521 |
|
|
11/1947 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8726 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Wakefield (25A) |
|
|
17/09/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 48726 |
|
|
08/10/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Farnley Junction (25G) |
|
|
22/10/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Huddersfield Hillhouse (25B) |
|
|
19/11/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Farnley Junction (25G) |
|
|
11/02/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A) |
|
|
31/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (6C) |
|
|
28/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (6C) |
|
|
05/10/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aston (3D) |
|
|
15/07/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (21B) |
|
|
26/03/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Monument Lane (2H) |
|
|
17/09/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 48726 |
|
|
01/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|