Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 604 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 3530 Week
» 5268 Month
» 132711 Year
» 1798087 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 7673 m/e 09/1944
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3122 m/e 05/1946
London and North Eastern Railway (1947) 3522 m/e 03/1947
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 8727 m/e 11/1947
British Railways 48727 w/e 30/07/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 8F
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Brighton Works
To Service During 09/1944
Withdrawal w/e Sat 03/08/1968
Service Life 23 yrs, 11 mths , 3 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 01/1969

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 09/1944
25A   Wakefield on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
25C   Goole w/e 15/10/1949
26A   Newton Heath 4w/e 09/09/1950
3A   Bescot 4w/e 08/09/1951
3A   Bescot w/e 13/10/1951
5C   Stafford 4w/e 01/12/1956
3A   Bescot 4w/e 26/01/1957
9D   Buxton (LNWR) w/e 10/12/1960
8B   Warrington Dallam w/e 12/01/1963
8E   Northwich w/e 16/03/1963
16D   Annesley w/e 25/05/1963
2F   Woodford Halse w/e 27/07/1963
16E   Kirkby in Ashfield w/e 29/02/1964
5B   Crewe South w/e 28/03/1964
8H   Birkenhead Mollington Street w/e 07/11/1964
8G   Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) w/e 17/04/1965
8E   Northwich w/e 20/05/1967
10F   Rose Grove w/e 09/03/1968
     Withdrawn w/e 03/08/1968

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 25A Wakefield w/e 08/11/1947
LOAN 12A Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 28/08/1948
EXLOAN 25A Wakefield w/e 02/10/1948
ALLOC 25C Goole w/e 15/10/1949
ALLOC 26A Newton Heath w/e 09/09/1950
ALLOC 3A Bescot w/e 13/10/1951
LOAN 5C Stafford 4w/e 01/12/1956
EXLOAN 3A Bescot 4w/e 26/01/1957
ALLOC 9D Buxton (LNWR) 4w/e 31/12/1960
ALLOC 8B Warrington Dallam 4w/e 02/02/1963
ALLOC 8E Northwich 4w/e 30/03/1963
ALLOC 16D Annesley 4w/e 01/06/1963
ALLOC 2F Woodford Halse 4w/e 03/08/1963
ALLOC 16E Kirkby in Ashfield 5w/e 07/03/1964
ALLOC 5B Crewe South 4w/e 04/04/1964
ALLOC 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street 4w/e 07/11/1964
ALLOC 8G Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) 4w/e 08/05/1965
ALLOC 8E Northwich 5w/e 10/06/1967
ALLOC 10F Rose Grove 4w/e 09/03/1968
WDN 10F Rose Grove w/e 03/08/1968

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
27/06/1965 Crewe Works (Erecting shop) Erecting shop: D1859/60/1, D1962-7, D202/11/32/4/95, D338/50/2, D1508/12/18/29/30/43/54/68, D5709/15, D8015/24, 44669/963, 45018/227/435/93, 48012/111/67/271/322/445/93/507/51/727, 70035/54, 92011/49/50/137/234. Electric shop: E3059/78/80/2/3, E26000. New Diesel shop: D222, D284, D290, D396, D1501/15/61, D1633. Paint shop: D1853/5-8, E3038/87, E26045, D8021, 71000 (stored outside). Traverser Area: 44679, 45327, 48116/768, D240, D1511/21, E3072. Side of Works: 44673/8/877/5004/190, 48474, 92021/212, 70023. Ex-Works: D248, D342, D1615/35/88, D6885, 44759, 45200, 45444/8, 48055, 70039, 92054/247. New diesel shop is the old 'cutting up' shop which has been converted into a light diesel repair shop. SLS/196508

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1944 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 7673
Built at Brighton Works
   
05/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3122    
03/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3522    
11/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 8727    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Wakefield (25A)    
30/07/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 48727    
15/10/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Goole (25C)    
09/09/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A)    
08/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Bescot (3A)    
13/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Bescot (3A)    
01/12/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Stafford (5C)    
26/01/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Bescot (3A)    
10/12/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Buxton (LNWR) (9D)    
12/01/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B)    
16/03/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Northwich (8E)    
25/05/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (16D)    
27/07/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (2F)    
29/02/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Kirkby in Ashfield (16E)    
28/03/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe South (5B)    
07/11/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (8H)    
17/04/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) (8G)    
20/05/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Northwich (8E)    
09/03/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Rose Grove (10F)    
03/08/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as 48727    
01/1969 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev