|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/10/1949 | Cowlairs Works | Locomotives entering Works during October: These included Nos. 61219, 61779/81, 61855, 1900, 62432/78, 2484, 3071, 3134/47/75/84, 4565, 64578, 4639, 4711/92, 4816, 64849, 4927, 65929/31, 7484/95, 8332/48, 68456, 69130, 9165, 69199, 9216, 69514, 9562, 77119, 79265. | SLS/194912 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/1946 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 3147 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1989 |
||
04/1947 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3547 | ||
12/1947 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 8752 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Mirfield (25D) | ||
26/03/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 48752 | ||
11/02/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A) | ||
08/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bescot (3A) | ||
13/10/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bescot (3A) | ||
08/11/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Aston (3D) | ||
07/11/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bescot (2F) | ||
26/03/1966 | Allocation | Reallocated to Oxley (2B) | ||
04/02/1967 | Allocation | Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) | ||
09/12/1967 | Allocation | Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) | ||
11/05/1968 | Allocation | Reallocated to Rose Grove (10F) | ||
03/08/1968 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 48752 | ||
02/1969 | Scrapped | Scrapped |