Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 4282 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17688 Week
» 70704 Month
» 190231 Year
» 3217084 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
3 |
on |
01/01/1878 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
Unclassified |
Company History |
CorR/GWR |
Wheels |
0-4-2ST |
Builder |
Falcon E & C |
To Service |
Mon 01/01/1878 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 25/10/1948 |
Service Life |
70 yrs, 9 mths , 24 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
on |
01/01/1878 |
MCH |
|
Machynlleth |
on |
15/06/1947 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
25/10/1948 |
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
Status Date |
17/09/2018 |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/01/1878 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 3 Built at Falcon E & C |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Machynlleth (MCH) |
|
|
25/10/1948 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 3 |
|
|