Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 1347 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19150 Week
» 72166 Month
» 191693 Year
» 3218546 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
3181 |
y/e |
1887 |
British Railways |
43181 |
m/e |
11/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
S. Johnson |
Class |
3F |
Company History |
MR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
During y/e 1887 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 13/04/1957 |
Service Life |
70 yrs, 4 mths , 14 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 05/1957 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
1887 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 3181 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Canklow (19C) |
|
|
03/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Canklow (19C) |
|
|
11/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 43181 |
|
|
03/12/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Grimesthorpe (19A) |
|
|
13/04/1957 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 43181 |
|
|
05/1957 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|