Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1747 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19550 Week
» 72566 Month
» 192093 Year
» 3218946 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
3183 |
y/e |
1887 |
British Railways |
43183 |
m/e |
04/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
S. Johnson |
Class |
3F |
Company History |
MR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
During y/e 1887 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 27/06/1959 |
Service Life |
72 yrs, 6 mths , 28 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
Sun 28/02/1960 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
y/e |
1887 |
15C |
|
Leicester Midland |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
20D |
|
Normanton |
3w/e |
24/01/1953 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
27/06/1959 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
20C |
Royston |
4w/e |
24/01/1953 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
24/06/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
1887 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 3183 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Leicester Midland (15C) |
|
|
04/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 43183 |
|
|
24/01/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Normanton (20D) |
|
|
27/06/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 43183 |
|
|
28/02/1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|