Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 1080 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14486 Week
» 67502 Month
» 187029 Year
» 3213882 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
3189 |
y/e |
1887 |
British Railways |
43189 |
m/e |
05/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
S. Johnson |
Class |
3F |
Company History |
MR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
During y/e 1887 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 03/12/1960 |
Service Life |
74 yrs , 3 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 01/1961 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/03/1960 |
Johnson/Fowler 3F 0-6-0 |
By late March, four Johnson rebuilt Fowler Class 3F 4' 11' 0-6-0 locomotives remained in stock, allocated as follows : Bescot 43189 (3A), Sutton Oak 43185 (8G), Gorton 43187 (9G), and Burton 43188 (17B). |
SLS/196006 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
1887 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 3189 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Carnforth (11A) |
|
|
27/03/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B) |
|
|
05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 43189 |
|
|
31/12/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
14/01/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
16/06/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
20/12/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gorton (9G) |
|
|
28/02/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (3A) |
|
|
18/06/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B) |
|
|
03/12/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 43189 |
|
|
01/1961 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|