Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 901 Today
» 1039 Yesterday
» 6432 Week
» 31266 Month
» 65598 Year
» 1730974 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 3257 y/e 1890
British Railways 43257 m/e 03/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer S. Johnson
Class 3F
Company History MR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Neilson, Reid & Co.
To Service During y/e 1890
Withdrawal w/e Sat 29/09/1962
Service Life 72 yrs, 9 mths , 30 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 10/1963 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) y/e 1890
22B   Gloucester Barnwood on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
21A   Saltley w/e 23/10/1948
20F   Skipton 4w/e 17/05/1952
20F   Skipton 8w/e 14/06/1952
24J   Lancaster Green Ayre 4w/e 12/07/1958
8B   Warrington Dallam w/e 07/11/1959
9D   Buxton (LNWR) w/e 16/09/1961
8B   Warrington Dallam w/e 23/09/1961
     Withdrawn w/e 29/09/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 21A Saltley w/e 23/10/1948
ALLOC 20F Skipton 4w/e 17/05/1952
ALLOC 24J Lancaster Green Ayre 4w/e 12/07/1958
ALLOC 8B Warrington Dallam 4w/e 28/11/1959
ALLOC 8B Warrington Dallam 4w/e 30/09/1961
WDN   w/e 29/09/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
28/02/1951 Derby Works During February, un-renumbered engines in Works were 7665 (5C), 7453 (10E), 762 (15D), 4409 (17A), 7125 (18A), 3334 (19A), 3449 (20B), 3656 (20D), 3257, 4203/24 (21A), 7567 (25G). Engines received from other regions for attention were (30A) 64781, (32A) 64731, (32B) 64900, (33C) 42505/11, (35C) 44476, (37A) 64760, 64840, (E) 4907, (38A) 64716, 64965, (40A) 64725, 64886, (71G) 44560, (71H) 43194, (84J) 2183, (85B) 2144, (86B) 2033. Engines despatched to other regions after repair include (30A) 64783, (32A) 64802, (32B) 64905, (33A) 42328, (33C) 42506, (35C) 40482, 44518, (36A) 64910/67, (37A) 64751, 64836, 64911, (38A) 64832, (40A) 64730, (71G) 44560, (84G) 43679, (87K) 42385. No. 58246 (LMS.3175) has come off works still with round-topped fire-box. The following withdrawn engines were cut up in February: 22853, 41012, 41962, 762, 41824, 43811; while Nos. 41011, 41955/60/3-5/8 and Crane 58865 were in the yard. Stored, near station: 40411/6, 40632, 41000/60, 43200/59, 43361/70, 43429. No. 43226 is in for special examination, and may be condemned.
At the end of the month, Nos. 407, 40418 an 40513, which have been in store for some time near the station, were returned to traffic.
SLS/195104
02/04/1958 Derby Works (off works) New construction on 2nd April was as follows : -D3503-6 almost complete, D3507-10 motors on, D3511-16 frames only. In the works yard for special examination were 40337, 41159, 41988/89, 43879. Fresh off works repainted after general repairs -40421, 40504, 43257, 43449 an 58123. SLS/195804

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
1890 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 3257
Built at Neilson, Reid & Co.
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Gloucester Barnwood (22B)    
23/10/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Saltley (21A)    
03/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 43257    
17/05/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Skipton (20F)    
14/06/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Skipton (20F)    
12/07/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Lancaster Green Ayre (24J)    
07/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B)    
16/09/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Buxton (LNWR) (9D)    
23/09/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B)    
29/09/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 43257    
10/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev prev