Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 838 Today
» 1039 Yesterday
» 6369 Week
» 31203 Month
» 65535 Year
» 1730911 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 3282 y/e 1891
British Railways 43282 m/e 06/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer S. Johnson
Class 3F
Company History MR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Neilson, Reid & Co.
To Service During y/e 1891
Withdrawal w/e Sat 13/10/1962
Service Life 71 yrs, 10 mths , 13 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 10/1963 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) y/e 1891
9D   Buxton (LNWR) on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
8B   Warrington Dallam w/e 10/06/1950
8B   Warrington Dallam 2w/e 17/06/1950
     Withdrawn w/e 13/10/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 8B Warrington Dallam w/e 10/06/1950
WDN   w/e 13/10/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
03/06/1961 Warrington Arpley Arpley sub-shed is actually responsible for the motor-workings on the Ditton Junc.-Widnes -Oxford Road services and its allocation is 41210/1/86/8-also stabled there are 43282, 43615 an 47406. SLS/196107

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
1891 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 3282
Built at Neilson, Reid & Co.
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Buxton (LNWR) (9D)    
10/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B)    
17/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B)    
06/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 43282    
13/10/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 43282    
10/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev prev