Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 3148 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16554 Week
» 69570 Month
» 189097 Year
» 3215950 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
3307 |
m/e |
12/1891 |
British Railways |
43307 |
w/e |
02/12/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
S. Johnson |
Class |
3F |
Company History |
MR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Kitson |
To Service |
During 12/1891 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 30/07/1960 |
Service Life |
68 yrs , 8 mths |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 08/1960 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1891 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 3307 Built at Kitson |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Lancaster Green Ayre (20H) |
|
|
04/03/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Albans (14C) |
|
|
15/04/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood East (14A) |
|
|
02/12/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 43307 |
|
|
08/03/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Grimesthorpe (41B) |
|
|
30/07/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 43307 |
|
|
08/1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|