Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 76 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17879 Week
» 70895 Month
» 190422 Year
» 3217275 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
3309 |
m/e |
01/1892 |
British Railways |
43309 |
m/e |
05/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
S. Johnson |
Class |
3F |
Company History |
MR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Kitson |
To Service |
During 01/1892 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 01/04/1961 |
Service Life |
69 yrs, 3 mths , 1 dy |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
18A |
Toton |
w/e |
28/04/1951 |
ALLOC |
21A |
Saltley |
4w/e |
28/11/1959 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
01/04/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1892 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 3309 Built at Kitson |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Staveley (Barrow Hill) (18D) |
|
|
05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 43309 |
|
|
28/04/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (18A) |
|
|
19/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (18A) |
|
|
07/11/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Saltley (21A) |
|
|
01/04/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 43309 |
|
|
07/1961 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|