Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 892 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14298 Week
» 67314 Month
» 186841 Year
» 3213694 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
3373 |
y/e |
1892 |
British Railways |
43373 |
m/e |
03/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
S. Johnson |
Class |
3F |
Company History |
MR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Sharp Stewart |
To Service |
During y/e 1892 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 21/05/1960 |
Service Life |
68 yrs, 5 mths , 21 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 11/1960 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
1892 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 3373 Built at Sharp Stewart |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Gloucester Barnwood (22B) |
|
|
03/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 43373 |
|
|
24/10/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bedford (14E) |
|
|
07/11/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bedford (14E) |
|
|
21/05/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 43373 |
|
|
11/1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|