Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 157 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17960 Week
» 70976 Month
» 190503 Year
» 3217356 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
3387 |
y/e |
1892 |
British Railways |
43387 |
m/e |
04/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
S. Johnson |
Class |
3F |
Company History |
MR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Sharp Stewart |
To Service |
During y/e 1892 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 19/12/1959 |
Service Life |
68 yrs , 19 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 09/1961 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
4w/e |
02/11/1957 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
19/12/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
1892 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 3387 Built at Sharp Stewart |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Buxton (LNWR) (9D) |
|
|
04/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 43387 |
|
|
30/11/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B) |
|
|
19/12/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 43387 |
|
|
09/1961 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|