Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 3145 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16551 Week
» 69567 Month
» 189094 Year
» 3215947 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
3396 |
y/e |
1892 |
British Railways |
43396 |
m/e |
12/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
S. Johnson |
Class |
3F |
Company History |
MR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Sharp Stewart |
To Service |
During y/e 1892 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 17/08/1957 |
Service Life |
65 yrs, 8 mths , 18 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
Fri 30/08/1957 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
y/e |
1892 |
7D |
|
Rhyl |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
17/08/1957 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
7D |
Rhyl |
w/e |
03/05/1947 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
17/08/1957 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/07/1947 |
North Wales |
There are signs that North Wales is not the hunting ground it was during the war years for those seeking ex-L.N.W. locos.-particularly on passenger work. The Afon Wen line is now in the hands of 2-6-4 tanks on all passenger turns, and the new 2-6-2 tanks (Nos. 1200/1) work the Amlwch branch (goods and passenger), though there is still one roster for an ex-L.N.W. 2-4-2 tank. The Bettws-y-Coed-Blaenau Festiniog line has 2-6-2 tanks on passenger turns but L.N.W. 'Cauliflowers' work the goods turns. Bethesda branch passenger service is 'motor' fitted and worked by an ex-L.N.W. 'Coal Tank, which also does two trips to Carnarvon and back daily; an ex-L.N.W. 'Cauliflower' works the branch goods and sometimes has to have the branch 'Coal Tank' to assist it. The Chester-Denbigh, Rhyl-Denbigh and Denbigh-Corwen branches still have a considerable number of passenger turns for ex-L.N.W. locos.; in fact, the Denbigh ex-L.N.W. 2-4-2 tanks seem to work the hardest in all North Wales. The one time L. and Y. 0-6-0 at Denbigh for goods work has been replaced by Midland Class 3 0-6-0 No. 3396, while the Red Wharf Bay branch has a thrice weekly goods turn (M.W. and F.) worked by a L. and Y. 0-6-0 from Bangor. 'Lanky' 0-6-0's have replaced all the old L.N.W. 'Coal' engines at Bangor. Holywell Town branch is worked by a 'motor' fitted ex-L.N.W. 'Coal' tank which returns to Rhyl each night. Mold Junction shed has all the L.N.W. 0-8-0's now required for goods turns in North Wales-it seems strange for Llandudno Junc. to have none of this class. Indeed, except for pilot work and the Blaenau goods, the latter shed seems to have no regular rosters for ex-L.N.W. locos. Bangor is the possessor of most ex-L.N.W. locos. and includes 2-4-2T's, 0-6-2T's ('Coal' and 'Radial') and 0-6-0's, and the last 'Precursor' No. 25297, which is usually employed on the night milk train to Liverpool. With the introduction of more 2-6-4T and 2-6-2T into North Wales, the few ex-L.N.W. passenger 'Links' will soon disappear, and goods and pilot work will be the only jobs left. |
SLS/194709 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
1892 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 3396 Built at Sharp Stewart |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Rhyl (7D) |
|
|
12/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 43396 |
|
|
17/08/1957 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 43396 |
|
|
30/08/1957 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|