Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 29 Online
» 2841 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16247 Week
» 69263 Month
» 188790 Year
» 3215643 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
3405 |
y/e |
1893 |
British Railways |
43405 |
m/e |
02/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
S. Johnson |
Class |
3F |
Company History |
MR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Sharp Stewart |
To Service |
During y/e 1893 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 18/02/1961 |
Service Life |
68 yrs, 2 mths , 19 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 08/1961 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
y/e |
1893 |
18A |
|
Toton |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
15C |
|
Leicester Midland |
w/e |
07/02/1959 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
18/02/1961 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
4w/e |
28/02/1959 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
18/02/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
1893 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 3405 Built at Sharp Stewart |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Toton (18A) |
|
|
02/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 43405 |
|
|
07/02/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15C) |
|
|
18/02/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 43405 |
|
|
08/1961 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|