Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1432 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14838 Week
» 67854 Month
» 187381 Year
» 3214234 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
3406 |
y/e |
1893 |
British Railways |
43406 |
m/e |
08/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
S. Johnson |
Class |
3F |
Company History |
MR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Sharp Stewart |
To Service |
During y/e 1893 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 20/02/1960 |
Service Life |
67 yrs, 2 mths , 21 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 05/1960 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
17A |
Derby |
w/e |
18/10/1947 |
ALLOC |
17B |
Burton |
4w/e |
23/02/1952 |
ALLOC |
41B |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
4w/e |
28/03/1958 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
19/02/1960 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
1893 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 3406 Built at Sharp Stewart |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Derby (17A) |
|
|
08/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 43406 |
|
|
23/02/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Burton (17B) |
|
|
08/03/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Grimesthorpe (41B) |
|
|
20/02/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 43406 |
|
|
05/1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|