Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 857 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18660 Week
» 71676 Month
» 191203 Year
» 3218056 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
3419 |
y/e |
1892 |
British Railways |
43419 |
m/e |
06/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
S. Johnson |
Class |
3F |
Company History |
MR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
During y/e 1892 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 06/09/1958 |
Service Life |
66 yrs, 9 mths , 7 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 07/1959 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
22E |
Highbridge |
w/e |
29/10/1949 |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
30/09/1958 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
06/03/1959 |
Over and Wharton branch (Badnall Wharf) |
One track of this short branch from Acton Bridge contains the LTS locos. shown as transferred to Spital Bridge (Peterboro') on 6th March 'condemned' in official lists viz. 41928/39/41/5/6/8/50/77/8/81-7/90-3, also ex LNWR 0-8-0s 48945, 49109/13/17/57/80, 49226/330/68. Another LTS loco, is at Badnall Wharf (between Norton Bridge and Standon Bridge) viz. 41936 along with 41078/156/724, 43419/631, 50646/725/57/77/818/31/55/65, 51424/53, 52399/517, 58066/196. |
SLS/195904 |
02/06/1959 |
Locomotives Sold |
On 2nd June L. & Y. 50818/31/55/65 were removed from Badnall Wharf to Messrs. A. Looms, Spondon, Derby. On 8th June Compounds 41078 an 41156 and Class 3F 43419 an 43631 were removed to Messrs. Steel and Co. Ltd., Coatbridge Iron Works, Whifflet, Lanarks. |
SLS/195907 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
1892 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 3419 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bristol Barrow Road (22A) |
|
|
06/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 43419 |
|
|
29/10/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Highbridge (22E) |
|
|
11/06/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Templecombe (S&D) (71H) |
|
|
06/09/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 43419 |
|
|
07/1959 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|