Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1433 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19236 Week
» 72252 Month
» 191779 Year
» 3218632 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
3520 |
y/e |
1897 |
British Railways |
43520 |
m/e |
05/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
S. Johnson |
Class |
3F |
Company History |
MR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
To Service |
During y/e 1897 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 05/12/1959 |
Service Life |
63 yrs , 5 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 09/1960 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
1897 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 3520 Built at Neilson, Reid & Co. |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stratford-on-Avon (LMS) (21D) |
|
|
05/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 43520 |
|
|
21/02/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bournville (21B) |
|
|
05/09/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Saltley (21A) |
|
|
03/12/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gloucester Barnwood (22B) |
|
|
24/10/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bedford (14E) |
|
|
05/12/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 43520 |
|
|
09/1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|