Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 1022 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18825 Week
» 71841 Month
» 191368 Year
» 3218221 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
3570 |
m/e |
08/1899 |
British Railways |
43570 |
m/e |
06/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
S. Johnson |
Class |
3F |
Company History |
MR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Kitson |
To Service |
During 08/1899 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 04/06/1960 |
Service Life |
60 yrs, 10 mths , 4 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 07/1960 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
08/1899 |
11A |
|
Carnforth |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
4A |
|
Shrewsbury |
w/e |
17/01/1948 |
17B |
|
Burton |
w/e |
21/02/1959 |
17A |
|
Derby |
w/e |
12/03/1960 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
04/06/1960 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1899 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 3570 Built at Kitson |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Carnforth (11A) |
|
|
17/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Shrewsbury (4A) |
|
|
06/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 43570 |
|
|
21/02/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Burton (17B) |
|
|
12/03/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
04/06/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 43570 |
|
|
07/1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|