Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 1583 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19386 Week
» 72402 Month
» 191929 Year
» 3218782 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
3669 |
y/e |
1900 |
British Railways |
43669 |
m/e |
04/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
S. Johnson |
Class |
3F |
Company History |
MR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
To Service |
During y/e 1900 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 15/02/1964 |
Service Life |
64 yrs, 2 mths , 16 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 03/1964 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
1900 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 3669 Built at Vulcan Foundry |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Canklow (19C) |
|
|
04/1951 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 43669 |
|
|
03/12/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Grimesthorpe (19A) |
|
|
16/09/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Canklow (41D) |
|
|
11/11/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Burton (17B) |
|
|
07/04/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
15/02/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 43669 |
|
|
03/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|