Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 6 Online
» 110 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17913 Week
» 70929 Month
» 190456 Year
» 3217309 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
3756 |
y/e |
1902 |
British Railways |
43756 |
m/e |
05/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
S. Johnson |
Class |
3F |
Company History |
MR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
To Service |
During y/e 1902 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 22/09/1962 |
Service Life |
60 yrs, 9 mths , 23 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
Sat 24/11/1962 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
26A |
Newton Heath |
4w/e |
21/04/1956 |
ALLOC |
24H |
Hellifield |
4w/e |
18/05/1957 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
22/09/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
1902 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 3756 Built at Neilson, Reid & Co. |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Belle Vue (19E) |
|
|
05/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 43756 |
|
|
21/04/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A) |
|
|
18/05/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hellifield (24H) |
|
|
22/09/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 43756 |
|
|
24/11/1962 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|