Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 287 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18090 Week
» 71106 Month
» 190633 Year
» 3217486 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
3763 |
y/e |
1902 |
British Railways |
43763 |
m/e |
10/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
S. Johnson |
Class |
3F |
Company History |
MR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
To Service |
During y/e 1902 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 10/03/1962 |
Service Life |
60 yrs, 3 mths , 8 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 06/1963 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
03/01/1952 |
Derby Works (near station) |
New construction included 73029 (complete), 41320 (complete), 41321 (boiler on), 41322/3 (frames only), 12098 (complete) and 12099 (almost complete). In store near station 43402, 43572, 43763, 58174, 58219/24. In Works Yard 40741, 41009 (Tender 2568/99), 41015 (Tender 2278/01)-marked 'for Crewe,' 41019 (Tender 3055/21), 41041 (Tender 1909/80), 58042, 58252. |
SLS/195203 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
1902 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 3763 Built at Neilson, Reid & Co. |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Derby (17A) |
|
|
10/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 43763 |
|
|
25/01/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) (10D) |
|
|
13/12/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gorton (9G) |
|
|
02/05/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15C) |
|
|
03/10/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gorton (9G) |
|
|
10/03/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 43763 |
|
|
06/1963 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|