Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 29 Online
» 2332 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15738 Week
» 68754 Month
» 188281 Year
» 3215134 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
|
7081 |
26/05/1939 |
|
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
12004 |
02/04/1949 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
D3/7 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
Cost when Built |
£8,429.00 |
To Service |
26/05/1939 |
Withdrawn |
09/12/1967 |
Time in Service |
28 yrs, 6 mths , 13 dys |
Cut Up |
05/1968 |
Cut At |
Cashmore's (Great Bridge) |
Status |
Scrapped |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
26/05/1939 |
|
No train brakes |
WR ATC |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
26/05/1939 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway number D7081 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
07/12/1940 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
02/04/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 12004 |
|
|
13/11/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
05/11/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Monument Lane (21E) |
|
|
26/11/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (21B) |
|
|
16/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ryecroft (Walsall) (2G) |
|
|
29/04/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
09/12/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 12004 |
|
|
05/1968 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|