Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 324 Today
» 825 Yesterday
» 2025 Week
» 10140 Month
» 137583 Year
» 1802959 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 7228 m/e 09/1901
British Railways 47228 m/e 04/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer S. Johnson
Class 3F
Company History MR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder Vulcan Foundry
To Service During 09/1901
Withdrawal w/e Sat 08/02/1964
Service Life 62 yrs, 5 mths , 8 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 02/1965

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 09/1901
14A   Cricklewood East on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
19A   Sheffield Grimesthorpe 8w/e 29/11/1952
8E   Brunswick 4w/e 16/06/1957
27E   Walton on the Hill w/e 10/01/1959
8L   Aintree w/e 14/12/1963
     Withdrawn w/e 08/02/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 15D Bedford m/e 31/01/1946
ALLOC 19A Sheffield Grimesthorpe 4w/e 29/11/1952
ALLOC 8E Brunswick 4w/e 15/06/1957
ALLOC 27E Walton on the Hill 5w/e 31/01/1959
ALLOC 8L Aintree 5w/e 11/01/1964
WDN   w/e 08/02/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
07/05/1962 Derby Works (Erecting Shop) Diesel Erecting Shop: ED3, D63, D70, D84, D105, D168, D3117, D5028/88. Test House: D166/7, 13306, Midland Pullman coaches Nos. u60091/2, u60732/42. Shunter test house: D3067. New Building: D171-D180. Finishing Shop: D81, D169/170, 10203. Erecting Shop: D2504/8, D3019/68, D3368, 13051, 13120, 42071, 42178, 43949, 44210/33/44, 44571, 47004, 47228, 48098, 48386, 53808, 73053, 73140/58. Paint Shop: MR1000, 48687 (15D). 'Stone Pit': 48183, 73039. 'Foundry Row': 41168, 42099, 42352, 43263, 43410/35, 47340/66. 'Bone Yard': 42332. 'Klondyke Sidings': ED1, 12000, 42069, 42283, 43985, 44154, 44561, 44583, 48381. Shop Road: 44049/92, 48261/72, 68030. Works Shunt: D2377, D3168.
EXPLANATORY NOTES-Stone Pit: Track adjoining Diesel Finishing Shop. Foundry Row: Name explains itself. Bone Yard: Dump opposite station adjoining main Works Offices. Klondyke: Works arrival sidings between new Paint Shop and Test House.
SLS/196206

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1901 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 7228
Built at Vulcan Foundry
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Cricklewood East (14A)    
04/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 47228    
29/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Grimesthorpe (19A)    
16/06/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Brunswick (8E)    
10/01/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Walton on the Hill (27E)    
14/12/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (8L)    
08/02/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 47228    
02/1965 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev