Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 329 Today
» 825 Yesterday
» 2030 Week
» 10145 Month
» 137588 Year
» 1802964 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 7258 m/e 08/1902
British Railways 47258 m/e 09/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer S. Johnson
Class 3F
Company History MR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder Vulcan Foundry
To Service During 08/1902
Withdrawal w/e Sat 16/11/1957
Service Life 55 yrs, 3 mths , 16 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 01/1958

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 08/1902
4C   Swansea (Upper Bank) on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
27B   Aintree 4w/e 23/03/1957
     Withdrawn w/e 16/11/1957

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 5B Crewe South 4w/e 23/03/1957
LOAN 27B Aintree 4w/e 23/03/1957
WDN   w/e 16/11/1957
ALLOC 27B Aintree 4w/e 30/11/1957
ALLOC 91M To London Midland Region m/e 30/11/1957

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
17/10/1945 Swansea Paxton Street MPD Home engines on shed on 17/10 were: 1676, 2360/81/90, 7715/41, 7807, 7931/3/41, 8325/44/5, 8673/89/91, 9033, 9260, 9358, 27621, 28543, 28622. Other locos were 2307, 5245, 5318, 8324, 8688, 9019 of 4A and 7258 of 4C. SLS/194601

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1902 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 7258
Built at Vulcan Foundry
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Swansea (Upper Bank) (4C)    
09/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 47258    
23/03/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (27B)    
16/11/1957 Withdrawn Condemned as 47258    
01/1958 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev