Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 266 Today
» 825 Yesterday
» 1967 Week
» 10082 Month
» 137525 Year
» 1802901 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 7259 m/e 08/1902
British Railways 47259 m/e 07/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer S. Johnson
Class 3F
Company History MR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder Vulcan Foundry
To Service During 08/1902
Withdrawal w/e Sat 24/03/1962
Service Life 59 yrs, 7 mths , 21 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 04/1962

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 08/1902
4C   Swansea (Upper Bank) on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
27A   Bank Hall 4w/e 16/06/1957
27B   Aintree 4w/e 30/11/1957
     Withdrawn w/e 24/03/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 27A Bank Hall 4w/e 15/06/1957
ALLOC 27A Bank Hall 4w/e 30/11/1957
ALLOC 27B Aintree 4w/e 30/11/1957
ALLOC 91M To London Midland Region m/e 30/11/1957
WDN   w/e 24/03/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
09/06/1959 Derby Works (Erecting Shop, No. 1 Bay) Paint Shop-44028 I, 44092 G, 44211 G, 44588 G, D3772 New. Tender for 41000. No. 2835/1902 (3500 galls). Diesel Erecting Shop-ED4, ED5, 10202, 12034/53/54/56/62. New Work 8 D-E Sh. D3773-D3780 new. Test House-D1, D3491. Diesel Finishing Shop-D2, D5019, D5700/1. Erecting Shop, No. 1 Bay-42400 I, 43920 I, 44229 G, 47259 I, 47623 G, 48170 G, 48184 G, 48185 I, 48192 G, 48215 G, 48420 G, 48643 I, 48690 G, 48700 G, 73033 G, 73138 I, Stripping-42305/7, 42818, 44213. Erecting Shop, No. 2 Bay-41000 (complete, ready for paint shop), 44202 I, 45057 Casual, 45275 Casual, 48191 I, 80062 I ; Stripping - 48180. Erecting Shop, No. 3 Bay-5 1-Co-Co-1, 2300 H.P. D/E (D3-D7); 8 Bo-Bo, 1160 H.P. D/E (D5020-D5027). Yard-40047, 40413, 40420, 40550, 40680, 42354, 43223, 43873, 43939, 43970, 44597, 45128, 47309, 47538, 48356, 48385, 53806 Frames, 58279, 10100, 10800, 13084, D5018, Cecil Raikes. SLS/195907
16/03/1962 Derby Works (Works Sidings) Diesel Erecting Shop: D2, D110, D115, D122, D5018/35/75/6/80/6. Test House: D1, D3, D38, D75, D103, D161, D2213. New Building: D164-D173. Finishing Shop: D162/3, D5081/2/9. Erecting Shop: L. & N.W.R. 2650, D3124, 13117, 42089, 42198, 42343/50/85, 43453, 43950/85, 44092, 44262, 47003, 47165, 47336, 47427, 47627/67/74, 48182, 48211, 75035. Paint Shop: D160, 47643, 48490. Works Sidings: ED1, ED3, D123, D2506/8, D2912, D5022/92, D5133, 12000, 41168, 42332/56/63/75/87, 42448, 43410, 47218/59, 47601, 48099, 48442, 58228. Works Shunters: D2380, 47000, 47250. SLS/196204
06/04/1962 Derby Works (Works Sidings) Diesel Erecting Shop: D1, D3, D72, D90, D105, D2506, D2912, D3124, D3859, D5020/2/30/76/86/9/91/2. Test House: D162, D2908, D5029/88, D5136, 10203. New Building: D167-D176. Finishing Shop: D69, D74, D165/6, D5028, D5133. Erecting Shop: D3067/8, D3371, D3585/7, 13117/68/78, 42542, 44243, 44425, 47321, 47534, 48272/82, 48413, 48669/87, 53808, 73140, 75016. Paint Shop: D163 Leicestershire and Derbyshire Yeomanry, D164, M.R. 1000, 42350, Outside : 43982. Works Sidings: ED1, ED3, D2508, D5137, 12000, 41168, 42332/63/75, 42448, 43263, 43410/64, 43760, 43825, 43938/85, 44092, 44154, 44561/83, 47218/59, 47310/40, 47601, 48094, 'Spike Island' (Gasworks): Cut up remains of 42387, 44166, 47353 an 47516. SLS/196205

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1902 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 7259
Built at Vulcan Foundry
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Swansea (Upper Bank) (4C)    
07/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 47259    
16/06/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Bank Hall (27A)    
30/11/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (27B)    
24/03/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 47259    
04/1962 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev