Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 581 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 3507 Week
» 5245 Month
» 132688 Year
» 1798064 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
  7111 31/01/1942  
Post 1948 (1955 Num) 12024 17/06/1950  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built D3/7
Subclass/Rebuild History
ClassFrom
3/8B31/01/1942
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Derby Works
To Service 31/01/1942
Withdrawn 16/12/1967
Time in Service 25 yrs, 10 mths , 15 dys
Cut Up 01/03/1968
Cut At Cashmore's (Great Bridge)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
  (New) on 31/01/1942
12A Carlisle Kingmoor on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
91M To London Midland Region 4w/e 02/12/1950
8C Speke Junction 4w/e 31/12/1950
8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 08/08/1964
9B Stockport Edgeley w/e 28/11/1964
9D Newton Heath w/e 06/11/1965
   Withdrawn on 16/12/1967


Summary
Start Event Details Source See Also
31/01/1942 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 7111
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation dnapshot - Carlisle Kingmoor (12A)    
17/06/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 12024    
02/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to To London Midland Region (91M)    
31/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C)    
08/08/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
28/11/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Stockport Edgeley (9B)    
06/11/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (9D)    
16/12/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 12024    
01/03/1968 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev prev