Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 133 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17936 Week
» 70952 Month
» 190479 Year
» 3217332 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
|
7112 |
07/02/1942 |
|
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
12025 |
04/10/1952 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
07/02/1942 |
|
No train brakes |
WR ATC |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/02/1942 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway number D7112 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation dnapshot - Carlisle Kingmoor (12A) |
|
|
09/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
04/10/1952 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 12025 |
|
|
22/11/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
29/04/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
11/11/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 12025 from Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
10/1968 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Slag Reduction Co.: Ickles |
|
|