Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 1490 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14896 Week
» 67912 Month
» 187439 Year
» 3214292 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
|
7114 |
19/02/1942 |
|
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
12027 |
06/10/1951 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
D3/7 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
Cost when Built |
£8,822.00 |
To Service |
19/02/1942 |
Withdrawn |
04/11/1967 |
Time in Service |
25 yrs, 8 mths , 16 dys |
Cut Up |
03/04/1968 |
Cut At |
Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) |
Status |
Scrapped |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
19/02/1942 |
|
No train brakes |
WR ATC |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
19/02/1942 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway number D7114 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation dnapshot - Carlisle Kingmoor (12A) |
|
|
09/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
06/10/1951 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 12027 |
|
|
09/05/1953 |
Allocation |
Loaned to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
13/06/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
04/11/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 12027 |
|
|
03/04/1968 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Slag Reduction Co.: Ickles |
|
|