Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 101 Today
» 824 Yesterday
» 925 Week
» 18459 Month
» 118244 Year
» 1783620 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Pre Grouping 47 m/e 09/1915
Great Western Railway 1374 y/e 1923
Great Western Railway (2nd) 433 m/e 31/05/1947

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Dunbar
Class 45
Company History BMJR/GWR
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B09/1915
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
To Service During 09/1915
Withdrawal Thu 08/02/1951
Service Life 35 yrs, 5 mths , 8 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 09/1915
CHYS   Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 07/08/1948
RYR   Radyr 4w/e 31/12/1949
     Withdrawn on 08/02/1951

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC CHYS Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 07/08/1948
ALLOC RYR Radyr 4w/e 31/12/1949
WDN 88A Cardiff Cathays on 08/02/1951

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1915 To Service To service as BMR Number 47
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
   
1923 Renumbered Renumbered to 1374    
31/05/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 433    
07/08/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (CHYS)    
31/12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Radyr (RYR)    
08/02/1951 Withdrawn Condemned as 433    

prev prev