Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 329 Today
» 1021 Yesterday
» 4675 Week
» 4675 Month
» 71537 Year
» 1736913 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 198 m/e 12/1898

Locomotive Specifics
Class B
Company History BaR/GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Sharp Stewart
To Service During 12/1898
Withdrawal Sat 10/01/1948
Service Life 49 yrs, 1 mth , 11 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 12/1898
     Withdrawn on 10/01/1948

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN RYR Radyr m/e 31/01/1948

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/01/1948 Swindon Works Locomotives entering Works during January included: Nos. 198, 250, 1009, 1531, 2793, 2859/80/99, 2929/51, 3011/12/44, 3800/07/09/14, 4076/83/87, 4375, 4408, 4542/61,.4854, 4917/87, 5000/01/19/22/30/33/35/48/65/69/75/91/99, 5928/39/46/58/77/94, 6000/03/17/22, 6357/80, 6821/23/62/74, 6906/32, 7001/07, 7308, 9083, W.D. 77005/58/64, 78543/714/717, 79226/34 an 79303. Engines condemned during the same period included Nos. 242, 504, an 3585. Works pilots recently have been: Nos. 198, 905, 1713, an 1781, while 3561 has been on the carriage side. New work: Nos. 6981 , 6982 and 6983 were completed on 20/1, 26/1, and 3/2 respectively; the construction of the 0-6-0 Diesel-electric shunters (Lot 364) is now under way, and the engine of the first one has been mounted on the frames. The first engine to be lettered 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' and to bear the prefix 'W' in yellow paint, under the numberplate was No. 4946 , which was ex Works on 8/1 (right-hand side only) and later emerged with both sides done on 16/1. Additional locomotives leaving the Works have been dealt with in various styles, as follows: Nos. 4100, 4217, an 5514 with 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' on the tank sides and prefixed with a yellow 'W' (Subsequently to 26/1, all prefixes have been in white paint). Nos. 1017, 4062, 4084, 4087, an 4951 were lettered 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' and prefixed 'W'; 2880, 5388, 5529, an 6736 with plain tenders and tanks and prefixed with a 'W,' while 2830 carried 'G.W.R.' on the tender and prefixed 'W.' On 23/1 No. 7007 had the old nameplates removed and was renamed Great Western, and on 30/1 No. 7001 emerged from the Works renamed Sir James Milne, with the tender bearing 'G.W.R.' and crest; the number had not been prefixed. All W.D.'s now entering the Works have had the Westinghouse pump removed, presumably at the running sheds SLS/194803
31/03/1948 Swindon Works Locomotives entering Works during March included: Nos. 1006/16, 1434, 1861, 2943/44, 3015, 3803/53/60, 4012/16/23/26/30/35/77/90/94, 4803, 4941/98, 5006/09/25/59/68/80/97, 5339/50/78, 5901/07/48/83, 6011/13/19/22, 6318/20/22/65, 6903/20/23/42/51, 7001, 9089 an 9302. New work: Nos. 6986-89 and 0-6-0 Diesel-electric No. 15101, the latter with cast brass number plates and 'British Railways' on the sides; also numbers in 3' letters in the centre of the buffer beams. W.D. Nos. 77060/145/280/335, 79244 (all ex repair in Belgium) and 78624 arrived in the Works on 23/3 from Marston sidings. W.D. Nos. 77027 an 77165 are ex Works with G.W. type top feed and Wakefield lubricator. Works' pilots recently have been and are Nos. 198, 250, 410, 1713 an 2781; 905 ceased to work on these duties W/E 13/3 and has gone for scrapping. No. 1358 was in the Works W/E 13/3 for scrapping, while No. 3004 was cut up in the same week. No. 6022 LA went on the test plant on 18/3 for several days and is now being prepared to go to the L.N.E.R. Engines ex Works are now emerging without the prefix W. SLS/194805
30/04/1948 Swindon Works Locomotives entering Works during April included: Nos. 1422/53, 2053, 2230/33, 2414, 2805/10/25, 2915/30/34/35, 3421, 3610, 3709, 3824/48/58, 4017/19/50/89/92/99, 4248/57, 4500/24/50/74/75, 4706, 4906/09/37/63/64, 5037,91/95, 5314, 5900/06124/30/41/60/64/81, 6009/21/26, 6119/24/34/51/62/68, 6313/56/72/98, 6806/63, 6918, 7003, 7321, W.D. 77000, 78607, 79283/288. W.D. No. 77060/145/280/335, 78624 an 79244 have had their tenders removed and were taken to the stock shed on 25/3, where they are now stored. Works' pilots have been: Nos. 198, 1713/53, 2781 an 15102 PDN. New Work 30/4: 15102 PDN (being run in as Works' pilot); 6990; 9662 NPT, 9663 TN, 9664 NPT, 9665, 9666 NEA; 7008 being nearly complete. Engines condemned during April included: Nos. 302 an 3408 SLS/194806

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1898 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 198
Built at Sharp Stewart
   
10/01/1948 Withdrawn Condemned as 198    

prev