Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 6 Online
» 288 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18091 Week
» 71107 Month
» 190634 Year
» 3217487 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
258 |
m/e |
12/1894 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
B1 |
Company History |
BaR/GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Sharp Stewart |
To Service |
During 12/1894 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 24/11/1949 off Barry (CV.BRY) |
Service Life |
54 yrs, 11 mths , 25 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
12/1894 |
CV.BRY |
|
Barry |
on |
15/06/1947 (Snapshot) |
CV.BRY |
|
Barry |
4w/e |
23/04/1949 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
24/11/1949 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
RYR |
Radyr |
4w/e |
04/10/1947 |
ALLOC |
BRY |
Barry |
4w/e |
23/04/1949 |
WDN |
BRY |
Barry |
m/e |
30/11/1949 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1894 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 258 Built at Sharp Stewart |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Barry (CV.BRY) |
|
|
23/04/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Barry (CV.BRY) |
|
|
24/11/1949 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 258 from Barry (BRY) |
|
|