Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1158 Today
» 5975 Yesterday
» 7133 Week
» 105778 Month
» 308442 Year
» 3335295 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
267 |
m/e |
06/1900 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
B1 |
Company History |
BaR/GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Sharp Stewart |
To Service |
During 06/1900 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 27/03/1951 |
Service Life |
50 yrs, 9 mths , 24 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
06/1900 |
RYR |
|
Radyr |
4w/e |
11/01/1936 |
CHYS |
|
Cardiff Cathays |
4w/e |
07/03/1936 |
CV.BRY |
|
Barry |
on |
15/06/1947 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
27/03/1951 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
31/03/1951 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1900 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 267 Built at Sharp Stewart |
|
|
11/01/1936 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Radyr (RYR) |
|
|
07/03/1936 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (CHYS) |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Barry (CV.BRY) |
|
|
27/03/1951 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 267 |
|
|