Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 84 Today
» 824 Yesterday
» 908 Week
» 18442 Month
» 118227 Year
» 1783603 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Pre Grouping 37 m/e 12/1909
Great Western Railway (1st) 21 y/e 1924
Great Western Railway (2nd) 422 m/e 30/09/1947

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Dunbar
Class Unclassified
Company History BMJR/GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
To Service During 12/1909
Withdrawal Mon 12/06/1950
Service Life 40 yrs, 6 mths , 13 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 12/1909
     Withdrawn on 12/06/1950

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN STJ Severn Tunnel Junction m/e 30/06/1950

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
08/10/1950 Swindon Works On the occasion of the visit on 8/10/50, interesting engines were 7925 Westol Hall (83G), 6770, 9429 (RSH.7566/50), 8464 (YEC.2457/50), 7926 (not painted), 7924 Thornycroft Hall; new construction included 7927-7929 an 6771 onwards. The stock shed contained 5 Portishead, 992, 1366/69/71, 2014/7, 2195, 2754, 2894/5, 3453, 3645, 3666, 3866, 4055, 4901/25/56, 5068, 5084, 5086, 5523, 5534, 5700, 5924, 6102/7, 6716, 6915, 6924, 7037 (no name), 7923 Speke Hall; there were two new tanks in the running shed, 8422 an 9428 (RSH.7565/50). On the dump were 46, 281, 294, 422, 428, 1747, 1919, 1949, 1989, 2006, 2022, 2047, 2064, 2716, 2794, 3386, and S. & M. 'Coal Engines' 8108 (8182 & 8236 partly dismantled). It is reported that 8463 (0-6-0T) has no works plate, and that 9427 is RSH. 7564/50, but it may not be generally known that the makers' plates are fixed only to the left side leading splashers on these engines. SLS/195012
18/11/1950 Swindon Works New construction 18/11/50-7820 Dinmore Manor, 7821 (painted), 7822 well forward, 7823-7827 laid down; 6772/4 in shed, 6775 completed and 6776/7 nearly so; 6778/9 laid down: 8466 Y.E. Co. 2459/50, 9432 R.S.H. 7569/50. Being cut up: 2738, 1799, 3168 (?); in the dump 46, 281, 294, 422, 1705/47/89, 1858/70, 1949, 2022/47/64, 2155/89, 2754/60, 3386. SLS/195101

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1909 To Service To service as BMR Number 37
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 21    
30/09/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 422    
12/06/1950 Withdrawn Condemned as 422    

prev prev