Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 77 Today
» 824 Yesterday
» 901 Week
» 18435 Month
» 118220 Year
» 1783596 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Pre Grouping 40 m/e 03/1914
Great Western Railway (1st) 698 y/e 1924
Great Western Railway (2nd) 425 m/e 31/07/1947

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Dunbar
Class Unclassified
Company History BMJR/GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
To Service During 03/1914
Withdrawal Tue 20/02/1951
Service Life 36 yrs, 11 mths , 22 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 03/1914
CDF   Cardiff Canton 4w/e 28/01/1950
     Withdrawn on 20/02/1951

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC CDF Cardiff Canton 4w/e 28/01/1950
WDN   m/e 31/03/1951

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1914 To Service To service as BMR Number 40
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 698    
31/07/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 425    
28/01/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CDF)    
20/02/1951 Withdrawn Condemned as 425    

prev prev