Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 92 Today
» 824 Yesterday
» 916 Week
» 18450 Month
» 118235 Year
» 1783611 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Pre Grouping 41 m/e 03/1914
Great Western Railway (1st) 888 y/e 1924
Great Western Railway (2nd) 426 m/e 30/04/1947

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Dunbar
Class Unclassified
Company History BMJR/GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
To Service During 03/1914
Withdrawal Tue 21/03/1950
Service Life 36 yrs , 20 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 03/1914
LTS   Llantrisant 4w/e 24/01/1948
PILL   Newport Pill m/e 31/05/1948
LTS   Llantrisant 4w/e 10/07/1948
PILL   Newport Pill 4w/e 04/09/1948
LTS   Llantrisant 4w/e 30/10/1948
     Withdrawn on 21/03/1950

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC LTS Llantrisant 4w/e 24/01/1948
ALLOC PILL Newport Pill m/e 31/05/1948
ALLOC LTS Llantrisant 4w/e 10/07/1948
ALLOC PILL Newport Pill 4w/e 04/09/1948
ALLOC LTS Llantrisant 4w/e 30/10/1948
WDN 86B Newport Pill m/e 31/03/1950

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1914 To Service To service as BMR Number 41
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 888    
30/04/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 426    
24/01/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Llantrisant (LTS)    
31/05/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Newport Pill (PILL)    
10/07/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Llantrisant (LTS)    
04/09/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Newport Pill (PILL)    
30/10/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Llantrisant (LTS)    
21/03/1950 Withdrawn Condemned as 426    

prev prev