Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 780 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14186 Week
» 67202 Month
» 186729 Year
» 3213582 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
12049 |
31/12/1949 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
11 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
Cost when Built |
£15,412.00 |
To Service |
31/12/1949 to Crewe South (5B) |
Withdrawn |
03/10/1971 |
Time in Service |
21 yrs, 9 mths , 2 dys |
Status |
Preserved |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
31/12/1949 |
|
No train brakes |
WR ATC |
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
31/12/1949 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 12049 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
08/09/1951 |
Allocation |
Loaned to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
29/09/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
06/11/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
22/06/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham (16A) |
|
|
09/01/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Saltley (21A) |
|
|
18/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Monument Lane (2H) |
|
|
23/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
22/04/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rugby (1F) |
|
|
11/01/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bletchley (1E) |
|
|
03/10/1971 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 12049 |
|
|