Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 704 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18507 Week
» 71523 Month
» 191050 Year
» 3217903 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
12053 |
13/05/1949 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
11 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
Cost when Built |
£15,412.00 |
To Service |
13/05/1949 to Crewe South (5B) |
Withdrawn |
18/04/1971 |
Time in Service |
21 yrs, 11 mths , 5 dys |
Cut Up |
11/1971 |
Cut At |
Birds (Long Marston) |
Status |
Scrapped |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
13/05/1949 |
|
No train brakes |
WR ATC |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
13/05/1949 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 12053 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
11/12/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
13/08/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bletchley (1E) |
|
|
14/01/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
15/06/1957 |
Allocation |
Loaned to Rugby (2A) |
|
|
04/04/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A) |
|
|
12/12/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Watford (1C) |
|
|
03/04/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
18/04/1971 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 12053 |
|
|
11/1971 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Birds: Long Marston |
|
|