Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 1135 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14541 Week
» 67557 Month
» 187084 Year
» 3213937 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
12060 |
11/11/1949 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
11/11/1949 |
|
No train brakes |
WR ATC |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/11/1949 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 12060 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
03/02/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (18A) |
|
|
21/11/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Coalville (15E) |
|
|
13/02/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (16C) |
|
|
10/12/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (9D) |
|
|
06/07/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
07/02/1971 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 12060 from Longsight (9A) |
|
|
11/1985 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by National Coal Board: Philadelphia |
|
|