Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 28 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 4655 Week
» 6393 Month
» 133836 Year
» 1799212 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Post 1948 (1955 Num) 12072 31/08/1950  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 11
Subclass/Rebuild History
ClassFrom
1131/08/1950
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Derby Works
To Service 31/08/1950 to Toton (18A)
Withdrawn 21/12/1968
Time in Service 18 yrs, 3 mths , 20 dys
Cut Up 01/12/1969
Cut At Cohens (Kettering)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
18A Toton (New) on 31/08/1950
84E Tyseley 4w/e 30/04/1951
18A Toton 3w/e 24/01/1953
9D Buxton (LNWR) 4w/e 26/02/1955
18A Toton 4w/e 26/03/1955
9D Buxton (LNWR) 8w/e 16/07/1955
18A Toton 4w/e 13/08/1955
9D Buxton (LNWR) 4w/e 08/10/1955
18A Toton 4w/e 05/11/1955
9D Buxton (LNWR) 4w/e 03/12/1955
18A Toton 4w/e 03/12/1955
9D Buxton (LNWR) 4w/e 25/02/1956
18A Toton 4w/e 24/03/1956
14A Cricklewood East m/e 16/06/1956
17A Derby w/e 27/06/1959
2F Woodford Halse w/e 14/11/1959
17A Derby w/e 30/01/1960
2F Woodford Halse w/e 14/05/1960
17A Derby w/e 24/09/1960
8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 10/12/1966
   Withdrawn on 21/12/1968


Summary
Start Event Details Source See Also
31/08/1950 To Service To service as British Railways Number 12072
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to Toton (18A)
   
30/04/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Tyseley (84E)    
24/01/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Toton (18A)    
26/02/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Buxton (LNWR) (9D)    
26/03/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Toton (18A)    
16/07/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Buxton (LNWR) (9D)    
13/08/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Toton (18A)    
08/10/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Buxton (LNWR) (9D)    
05/11/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Toton (18A)    
03/12/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Buxton (LNWR) (9D)    
03/12/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Toton (18A)    
25/02/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Buxton (LNWR) (9D)    
24/03/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Toton (18A)    
16/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Cricklewood East (14A)    
27/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (17A)    
14/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (2F)    
30/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (17A)    
14/05/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (2F)    
24/09/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (17A)    
10/12/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
21/12/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as 12072    
01/12/1969 Scrapped Broken up by Cohens: Kettering    

prev prev